This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:40 (UTC).

ZOILA LOPEZ VS JOSE LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ZOILA LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOSE LOPEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PALAFOX, JULIE A.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1708

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, ZOILA I

Respondent

LOPEZ, JOSE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHOREBREAK LAW

Respondent Attorney

EVANS FAMILY LAW

Other Attorneys

LISA M STRIBLING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 02/08/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/31/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure; Filing Party: LOPEZ, JOSE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 05/17/2017; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 10/20/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 10/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/01/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, JOSE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/01/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, JOSE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/01/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: LOPEZ, JOSE L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/07/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ZOILA I

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.