This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/04/2022 at 04:40:40 (UTC).

ZIAD BOUKAI VS. JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 ZIAD BOUKAI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAGUAR LAND ROVER NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ziad Boukai

Defendant

Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L. STARR, APC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875428.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875428.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/12/2022 07:48:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/12/2022 07:48:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21164034 RECEIVED ON 05/26/2022 09:57:19 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 10/06/2022 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 08/25/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/12/2022 07:48:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21157812 RECEIVED ON 05/11/2022 09:12:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BOUKAI, ZIAD ON 05/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13047412 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12875428.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 05/11/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC is a litigant