This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/28/2020 at 06:43:02 (UTC).

ZANETA LOZANO VS. JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LDT

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 ZANETA LOZANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LDT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZANETA LOZANO

Defendants

JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LDT

Jonathan Louis International LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Timothy J. Donahue

Defendant Attorney

Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12677391 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12502170.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12677391 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12502170.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 12/16/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 12/16/2019.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3867979 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3867979 REJECTED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/17/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 01/15/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 01/15/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12700719 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12525797.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12700719 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12525797.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: FELL; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12700719 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12525797.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41060665 RECEIVED ON 01/29/2020 05:43:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD ON 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 01/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2880512 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2020 02:50:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/26/2020 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3868197 RECEIVED ON 12/17/2019 02:14:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3867979 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12677391 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12502170.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3867774 RECEIVED ON 12/16/2019 03:41:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 12/16/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LOZANO, ZANETA ON 12/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONATHAN LOUIS INTERNATIONAL LTD. is a litigant