This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 04:56:25 (UTC).

ZACHARY FITEAN VS. SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 ZACHARY FITEAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zachary Fitean

Defendant

Sialic Contractors Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Greenfield Law Firm, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12546753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12370632.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12546753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12370632.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 05/02/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 05/02/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 07/25/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 07/25/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 08/09/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 08/09/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 08/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2825098 RECEIVED ON 08/09/2019 10:37:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 07/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4994361 RECEIVED ON 07/25/2019 10:09:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 05/02/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12546753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12370632.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FITEAN, ZACHARY ON 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3787625 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2019 04:42:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less