Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 04:21:37 (UTC).

YUNHEE KIM VS. JI YOUNG KIM

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 YUNHEE KIM filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against JI YOUNG KIM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent

YUNHEE KIM

Defendants, Appellants, Respondents and Others

JI YOUNG KIM

YUNHEE KIM

JONG DAE LEE

Cross Defendants

IK SOO BANG

HYE YOUNG BANG

Interested Party

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARD SCOTT HOUTZ

Defendant, Appellant, Respondent and Other Attorneys

CHARLES L. MURRAY

CHARLES L. MURRAY III

RICHARD SCOTT HOUTZ

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: DISMISSAL AND COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 AND DEPOSIT RETURN) FILED BY LEE, JONG DAE; KIM, JI YOUNG ON 05/22/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: DISMISSAL AND COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 AND DEPOSIT RETURN) FILED BY LEE, JONG DAE; KIM, JI YOUNG ON 05/22/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG ON 05/21/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY (CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG ON 05/21/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 03/15/2018 03:13:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 03/15/2018 03:13:00 PM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813360 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813360 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813168 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4813168 REJECTED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG ON 02/06/2018

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG ON 02/06/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 02/06/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 02/06/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 02/06/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 02/06/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, JI YOUNG FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 48,671.76, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12267972 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12091694.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KIM, JI YOUNG FOR INTERPLEADER DEPOSIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 48,671.76, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12267972 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12091694.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KIM, YUNHEE ON 11/14/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KIM, YUNHEE ON 11/14/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/01/2017 03:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/01/2017 03:36:00 PM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/24/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/24/2017

MOTION - OTHER (RELIEF FROM POSTING UNDERTAKING) FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/24/2017

MOTION - OTHER (RELIEF FROM POSTING UNDERTAKING) FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/24/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICAN LEGAL NETWORK FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242007 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065709.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICAN LEGAL NETWORK FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242007 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065709.

PAYMENT FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241306 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241306 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER AWARD FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/20/2017

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER AWARD FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/20/2017

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • RECEIPT # 12240126 VOIDED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF EF# 3669941. NFD LETTER SENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12416435 IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12416435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12240126.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (RE: DISMISSAL AND COURTS RETENTION OF JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 AND DEPOSIT RETURN) FILED BY LEE, JONG DAE; KIM, JI YOUNG ON 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3669941 RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018 07:06:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12359539 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12183309.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY LEE, JONG DAE ON 05/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4848178 RECEIVED ON 05/21/2018 07:30:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2605879 RECEIVED ON 10/24/2017 05:58:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICAN LEGAL NETWORK FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12242007 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • R#12065000 FOR EF#1433026 WAS VOIDED DUE TO PAYMENT POSTED TO WRONG PARTY. RE-POSTED TO CORRECT PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241306 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSIONER AWARD FILED BY KIM, JI YOUNG; LEE, JONG DAE ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/29/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 207 - APPEAL OF LABOR COMMISSION DECISION IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241306 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065000.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433026 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017 03:33:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LABOR COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Houtz, R. Scott