This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:51 (UTC).

YOUNG HONG VS. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 YOUNG HONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG HONG

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE BICKEL LAW FIRM, INC.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2016 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2016 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 02/26/2016.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 05/23/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 05/23/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 03/08/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751460.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751460.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 05/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3416763 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2016 01:27:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/22/2016 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3388833 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016 12:08:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751460.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY HONG, YOUNG ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385115 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:26:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.