This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 03:43:56 (UTC).

YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT VS. ALEX WINSBERG

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALEX WINSBERG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yorba Linda Water District

Defendants

Alex Winsberg

Alexander Todd Winsberg

Diane C. Stretch

Stacey Stretch Winsberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidman Gagen Law LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/11/2022 07:36:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/11/2022 07:36:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/10/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/10/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/20/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31241905 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2022 04:38:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 3) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21224741 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2022 12:39:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41395760 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2022 03:57:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/11/2022 07:36:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 03/16/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 01/19/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/16/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11046994 RECEIVED ON 10/04/2022 02:43:16 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 10/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT ON 10/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YORBA LINDA WATER DISTRICT is a litigant