This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/04/2022 at 20:09:27 (UTC).

YEAM V YEAM

Case Summary

On 01/30/2015 YEAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against YEAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0872

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kyoung S. Yeam

Petitioner

YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

Defendant

Danny Yeam

Respondent

YEAM, DANNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christine Chong

Petitioner Attorney

CHONG, CHRISTINE

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER 02/02/2016

MINUTE ORDER 02/02/2016

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/30/2015

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/30/2015

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/30/2015

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/30/2015

NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 01/07/2016

NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 01/07/2016

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/30/2015

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/30/2015

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/30/2015

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/30/2015

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 09/09/2015 10:34:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 09/09/2015 10:34:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/22/2015 14:22:00 # Pages:2

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/22/2015 14:22:00 # Pages:2

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:2

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:2

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:1

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:1

SUMMONS 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:2

SUMMONS 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:2

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/30/2015 14:58:00 # Pages:3

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/30/2015 14:58:00 # Pages:3

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION; Department: L60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketCONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 02/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 01/07/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DEFAULT - NO HEARING 12/30/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 12/30/2015; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 12/30/2015; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 09/09/2015 10:34:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/30/2015; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 07/30/2015; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/22/2015 11:43:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/22/2015 14:22:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/30/2015 14:58:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/30/2015 14:59:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: YEAM, KYOUNG SOOK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHONG, CHRISTINE