This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 11:00:59 (UTC).

WRW PROPERTIES, LLC VS. JVS DEVELOPMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2017 WRW PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JVS DEVELOPMENT LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

WRW PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

MAI ANH NGUYEN

CHANH NGUYEN

ADK BANCORP INC.

BROOKHURST TOWN CENTER, LLC

KATELYN NGUYEN

JVS DEVELOPMENT LLC

ADAN Q.C. PHAN

ARC RETAIL I, LLC

AMERILINK ESCROW, INC.

YOUNG SEOK SUH

TIEP M. TRAN

VINH C. PHAN

FIRST CHOICE BANK

HUNG X. DINH

STEPHEN P. NGUYEN

THEA MAI

JIMMY PHAN

QUYNH DINH

HANH T. NGUYEN

WRW PROPERTIES, LLC

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

WOODRUFF, SPRADLIN & SMART, APC

PAULA E. MEYER & ASSOCIATES, APC

CALLAHAN & BLAINE

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THE CHANG FIRM

BRIGGS & ALEXANDER, APLC

ATKINSON, ANDELSON, LOYA, RUUD & ROMO

FARMER CASE & FEDOR

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN D. WILSON

HAMILTON LAW OFFICES

FREEMAN, FREEMAN & SMILEY, LLP

GERARD FOX LAW, P. C

SAMINI SCHEINBERG, PC

SAMINI COHEN SPANOS LLP

THE LAW OFFICES OF ALEX L. BENEDICT & ASSOCIATES, APLC

WOODRUFF, SPRADLIN & SMART, APC

PAULA E. MEYER & ASSOCIATES, APC

CALLAHAN & BLAINE

Other Attorneys

JOEY P. MOORE, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Newmark Knight Frank Lega Department

THE LAW OFFICES OF ALEX L. BENEDICT &

GERARD FOX LAW, P.C.

Hall Griffin LLP

JOEY P. MOORE, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO VINH C. PHAN (07/26/2019 MINUTE ORDER)

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO VINH C. PHAN (07/26/2019 MINUTE ORDER)

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO STEPHEN P. NGUYEN RE 07/05/2019 MINUTE ORDER

RETURNED MAIL SENT TO STEPHEN P. NGUYEN RE 07/05/2019 MINUTE ORDER

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4980712 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4980712 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2765429 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2765429 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/26/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/26/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/22/2019 04:10:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/22/2019 04:10:00 PM.

CORRESPONDENCE (RETURNED MAIL) FILED BY PHAN, VINH C. ON 07/22/2019

CORRESPONDENCE (RETURNED MAIL) FILED BY PHAN, VINH C. ON 07/22/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HANH T. ON 07/19/2019

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HANH T. ON 07/19/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF OPPOSITION) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 07/15/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF OPPOSITION) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 07/15/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 07/15/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 07/15/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3807675 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3807675 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 2019-07-05 09:00:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICATION 2019-07-05 09:00:00.0.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

REPLY - OTHER (IN SUPPORT OF MSJ) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF YOUNG SEOK SUH) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

OBJECTION (TO DECLARATION OF YOUNG SEOK SUH) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

OBJECTION (TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

OBJECTION (TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE) FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 06/28/2019

414 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO VINH C. PHAN (07/26/2019 MINUTE ORDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL SENT TO STEPHEN P. NGUYEN RE 07/05/2019 MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4980712 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2765429 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/26/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/22/2019 04:10:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE (RETURNED MAIL) FILED BY PHAN, VINH C. ON 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY NGUYEN, HANH T. ON 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3814484 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2019 12:15:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
674 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY NGUYEN, CHANH; DINH, HUNG X.; DINH, QUYNH; TRAN, TIEP M. ON 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1418724 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017 02:36:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 08/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12208304 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12032012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WRW PROPERTIES, LLC ON 08/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3579180 RECEIVED ON 08/21/2017 04:27:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRW PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKHURST TOWN CENTER, LLC is a litigant