Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/15/2021 at 10:01:09 (UTC).

WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS. ACE COMMERCIAL PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ACE COMMERCIAL PLASTERING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Lyon Homes, Inc., a California corporation

Defendants

RC Earthworks, Inc., a California corporation

True Air Mechanical, Inc., a California corporation

Timberworks Construction, Inc., a California corporation

Insight Glass, a California corporation

Excel Cabinets, Inc., a California corporation

Padilla Construction Company, a California corporation

SHELTON CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC., A

Fiber Care Baths, Inc., a California corporation

American Woodmark Corporation, a Virginia corporation

BBR Masonry, Inc., a California corporation

FRANK CARSON LANDSCAPE & MAINTENANCE,

Professional Cabinet Solutions, a California corporation

Mission Sheet Metal, Inc., a California corporation

Cen Cal Plastering, Inc., a California corporation

Plumbing Concepts, Inc., a California corporation

Warda Glass, Inc., a California corporation

Gold Star Insulation, L.P., a Delaware Limited Partnership

Fence America, Inc., a California corporation

Eagle Lath & Plaster, Inc., a California corporation

105 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Newmeyer & Dillion LLP

Defendant Attorney

Kring & Chung

Other Attorneys

John L. Boze

Jacobsen & McElroy PC

Bowles & Verna LLP

Farmer Case & Fedor

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LEGACY FRAMERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/04/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LEGACY FRAMERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/04/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12838526 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12838526 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12666018.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 01/26/2021

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 02/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2020-12-31 15:31:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2021 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketTHE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12816392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12643458.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1792019 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2020 07:02:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 12/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WILLIAM LYON HOMES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ON 12/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANK CARSON LANDSCAPE & MAINTENANCE, is a litigant

Latest cases where Warda Glass, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Eagle Lath & Plaster, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Timberworks Construction, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant