This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 21:10:35 (UTC).

WILLIAM FAITH VS. JONATHAN ROGER WALLENTINE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 WILLIAM FAITH filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JONATHAN ROGER WALLENTINE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM FAITH

Defendants

ACTUARIAL MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

ACTUARIAL INSTITUTIONAL, LLC

MICHAEL BABIKIAN

SAM LUXENBURG

ACTUARIAL DIRECT, LLC

MICHAEL BELL

ZHIYI ZHOU

KEITH BOYAK

WILLIAM BRUCE VOSS

JONATHAN ROGER WALLENTINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUSHNER CARLSON, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060464.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060464.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 10/13/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 10/13/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/16/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/21/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/21/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 12/12/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 12/12/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 12/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2620666 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2017 08:46:50 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/21/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1443003 RECEIVED ON 11/21/2017 01:39:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/16/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1441652 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017 04:00:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/06/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3604761 RECEIVED ON 11/06/2017 09:05:45 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 11/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3603884 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2017 11:29:26 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12236784 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12060464.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4777587 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2017 03:50:18 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 10/13/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY FAITH, WILLIAM ON 10/13/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less