This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/21/2019 at 08:41:41 (UTC).

WESTMANN V WESTMANN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 WESTMANN filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against WESTMANN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WALTZ, JAMES L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5317

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

WALTZ, JAMES L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

Claimant

THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM

Respondent

WESTMANN, LAURIE A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EVANS FAMILY LAW

Claimant Attorney

POTTER, INA LYNN

Respondent Attorney

LUDWIG LAW CENTER INC

Other Attorneys

LUDWIG LAW CENTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/17/2014 08:52:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • JUDGMENT 09/11/2014 07:49:00 # Pages:21; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • JUDGMENT - STIPULATED 09/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/27/2014 13:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • STIPULATION - JUDGMENT 01/27/2014 12:10:00 # Pages:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE 01/27/2014 09:17:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE 01/24/2014 12:17:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/23/2014 09:40:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • DECLARATION - DUE DILIGENCE 01/23/2014 10:30:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 11/14/2012 11:59:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, LAURIE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/14/2012 11:59:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, LAURIE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/14/2012 11:59:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WESTMANN, LAURIE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2012
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 11/14/2012 16:43:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: WESTMANN, LAURIE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 10/22/2012 16:45:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • PETITION / COMPLAINT - AMENDED 09/13/2012 09:25:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/01/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/01/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • SUMMONS 06/01/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2012 11:21:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: WESTMANN, CRAIG E.

    Read MoreRead Less