This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/02/2022 at 05:37:45 (UTC).

WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC VS. DOMINIC WU

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DOMINIC WU. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC

Defendants

EMILY WU

DOMINIC WU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN P ERAMO.

Defendant Attorney

The Dreyfuss Firm, PLC

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/10/2020 11:47:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/10/2020 11:47:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 01/28/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 01/28/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2020 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/17/2020 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1706735 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1706735 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/16/2019 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/16/2019 09:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597007 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421106.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597007 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12421106.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WU, DOMINIC; WU, EMILY ON 08/01/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WU, DOMINIC; WU, EMILY ON 08/01/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WU, DOMINIC; WU, EMILY ON 08/01/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WU, DOMINIC; WU, EMILY ON 08/01/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 07/26/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 07/26/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/28/2019 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/28/2019 09:30:00 AM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 06/28/2019

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 06/28/2019

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 06/06/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 06/06/2019

CASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 06/13/2019.

CASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 06/13/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2019.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2024
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE; Department: C66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/10/2020 11:47:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/2024 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketTHE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/30/2024 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 02/10/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41059765 RECEIVED ON 01/28/2020 11:14:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 01/28/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 06/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2802734 RECEIVED ON 06/06/2019 03:20:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO CRAIG GRIFFIN EFFECTIVE 06/13/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12507928 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12331647.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4941682 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2019 03:16:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE, LLC ON 02/26/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westlake Village Marketplace, LLC is a litigant