This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:50 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES VS. JUDITH MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUDITH MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES

Defendant

JUDITH MARQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927376 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751601.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927376 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751601.

APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/07/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/07/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766838.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766838.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/02/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/02/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/25/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 03/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1324776 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2016 10:31:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930708 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754908.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4512522 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 03:56:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927376 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751601.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307030 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:10:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.