This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:15 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES VS. HEATHER PERSICO

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HEATHER PERSICO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES

Defendants

CRYSTAL M. ARMES

JAIME TERRAZAS

HEATHER PERSICO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/01/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/01/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11937050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761236.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11937050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761236.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12009027.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12009027.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 3/16/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/16/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 7/11/17) RECEIVED ON 07/07/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 7/11/17) RECEIVED ON 07/07/2017.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12185327 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12009027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 7/11/17) RECEIVED ON 07/07/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2570604 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2017 01:01:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4517782 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016 03:30:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927155 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751380.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446622 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:18:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less