Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 08:17:15 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES VS. CHRISTIAN MORA

Case Summary

On 10/13/2016 WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHRISTIAN MORA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES

Defendant

CHRISTIAN MORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 06/22/2017 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 06/22/2017 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION RECEIVED ON 05/15/2017.

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION RECEIVED ON 05/15/2017.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/15/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 05/15/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 03/15/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/16/17) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/16/17) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/08/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/08/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/15/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/10/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/07/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/28/2016

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/28/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/28/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 10/28/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12052814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11876759.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12052814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11876759.

OPPOSITION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/27/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/27/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/13/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/13/2016

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 06/22/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 06/15/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY CONTINUED TO 06/22/2017 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY SCHEDULED FOR 06/22/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY SCHEDULED FOR 06/15/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER (TO COMPLAINT) FILED BY MORA, CHRISTIAN ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • MORA, CHRISTIAN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/18/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MORA, CHRISTIAN ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12045062 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11869027.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4619992 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2016 07:45:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant