This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 09:31:56 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES VS. ALEJANDRA HERNANDEZ CORREA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2016 WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALEJANDRA HERNANDEZ CORREA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES

Defendants

ALEJANDRA HERNANDEZ CORREA

CARLTON HAYES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12269853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12093582.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12269853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12093582.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/06/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/06/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/18/17) RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/18/17) RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/26/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/26/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2017.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/18/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/18/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/01/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 02/01/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12093461 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11917440.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12093461 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11917440.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/20/17) RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/20/17) RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/20/17) RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/20/17) RECEIVED ON 01/18/2017.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 01/18/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 01/18/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906632.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906632.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12269853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12093582.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 12/18/17) RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2619187 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2017 04:18:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (TO SERVE BY POSTING) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12082664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11906632.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4653882 RECEIVED ON 12/27/2016 10:08:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12078186 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11902150.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL SECURITIES ON 12/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3490490 RECEIVED ON 12/15/2016 02:09:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.