This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:39 (UTC).

WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. VS. CIRSTINA SORIN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L P filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CIRSTINA SORIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P.

Defendant

CIRSTINA SORIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942671 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766846.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11942671 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11766846.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 04/06/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 04/06/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751419.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751419.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/04/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/04/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754530.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754530.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/02/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/02/2016.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/02/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 05/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4540988 RECEIVED ON 05/02/2016 10:09:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930330 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4510943 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2016 11:31:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927194 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751419.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WESTERN NATIONAL EL DORADO PARTNERS, L.P. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385153 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:10:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less