This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 03:53:09 (UTC).

WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP VS. STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/29/2014 WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP filed an Other lawsuit against STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP

Defendant

STATEWIDE CLAIMS ADVISORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOCAL LAW GROUP PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT -CIVIL GENERATED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT -CIVIL GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2015 09:57:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2015 09:57:00 AM.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/11/2015.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/11/2015.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1238326 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1238326 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/23/2015 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/23/2015 09:00:00 AM.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 01/07/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 01/07/2015

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4303803 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4303803 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/29/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/29/2014 09:00:00 AM.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEBORAH SERVINO EFFECTIVE 01/05/2015.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DEBORAH SERVINO EFFECTIVE 01/05/2015.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4259402 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4259402 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 10/01/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 10/01/2014

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT -CIVIL GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/07/2015 09:57:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/11/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 03/11/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4259402 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 10/01/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1193956 RECEIVED ON 10/01/2014 03:22:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/29/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 08/29/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11651583 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11475677.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER FILED BY WESTERN LAW CONNECTION, CORP ON 08/29/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4240023 RECEIVED ON 08/29/2014 05:03:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less