Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 09:10:50 (UTC).

WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC VS. JENNIFER BRADEN

Case Summary

On 10/17/2016 WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JENNIFER BRADEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

JENNIFER BRADEN

STEVEN F. FRANKIN JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/13/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/13/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/12/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/12/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/04/2016) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/04/2016) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871026.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871026.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 12/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3488843 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2016 12:29:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 11/04/2016) FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 11/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1352422 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2016 03:22:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871026.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WEST HILL AVENUE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 10/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4621838 RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016 03:55:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less