This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:20 (UTC).

WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC VS. JAIME DIAZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAIME DIAZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC

Defendants

ELIXER LIBATIONS, LLC

JAIME DIAZ

ELIXIR LIBATIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MICHAEL J. WOLF

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/16/2017; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/02/2017; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY MICHAEL J. WOLF IOLTA FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11992244 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11816344.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 06/29/2016; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 06/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/10/2016 01:43:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 4/27/16 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 04/27/2016; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 04/27/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 03/16/2016; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 03/16/2016; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 03/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WOLF IOLTA, MICHAEL J FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927216 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751441.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WEST COAST PRIME MEATS, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.