Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:55:01 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS. DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Insurance Company

Defendants

Rishi Barkataki

Medical Concierge Inc.

Invictus Health Group LLC

Tonmoy Sharma

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center Inc.

Shreya Health of Florida Inc.

Adeona Healthcare Inc.

Melody Yen

Sovereign Asset Management Inc.

Shreya Health of California Inc.

Shreya Health of Arizona Inc.

Vedanta Laboratories Inc.

Sovereign Health of Phoenix Inc.

Satya Health of California Inc.

Sovereign Health of Florida Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aires Law Firm

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850482 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678161.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850482 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678161.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/27/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12850482 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12678161.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1817094 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2021 06:12:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 02/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medical Concierge, Inc. is a litigant