This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/17/2021 at 07:35:40 (UTC).

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS. AMERICAN BUILDING AND REMODELING INC.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMERICAN BUILDING AND REMODELING INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Insurance Company

Defendant

American Building and Remodeling Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aires Law Firm

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803298.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803298.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/01/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/01/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1924161 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 06:18:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12975379 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12803298.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21092762 RECEIVED ON 11/23/2021 06:56:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 11/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY ON 11/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Building and Remodeling Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant