This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:48 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS. JASON M NORMAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON M NORMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

JASON M NORMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751399.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751399.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 04/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 04/07/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/03/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/03/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841050.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841050.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056775 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880740.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056775 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880740.

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12056775 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11880740.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/03/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3475693 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2016 11:01:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. IN THE AMOUNT OF 20332.65 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST NORMAN, JASON M .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016983 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11841050.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2482518 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2016 11:52:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 04/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4530090 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 03:28:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927174 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751399.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509387 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:42:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less