This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:53:05 (UTC).

WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC VS. CHARISMA BRANDS, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARISMA BRANDS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC

Defendant

CHARISMA BRANDS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 08/11/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 08/11/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927722 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751947.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927722 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751947.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 07/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 07/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 08/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3445192 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2016 01:42:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 07/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3436882 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2016 04:54:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927722 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751947.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WEISS-RHOLIG USA LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385273 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:29:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less