This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 04:46:48 (UTC).

WAYNE T. HETMAN VS. GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 WAYNE T HETMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE T. HETMAN

Defendant

GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CARLSON, CALLADINE & PETERSON

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 05/17/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 05/17/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A IN THE AM

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,155.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554966 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378839.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/29/2019 09:20:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/29/2019 09:20:00 AM.

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/25/2019

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/25/2019

NOTICE OF OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/24/2019

NOTICE OF OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/24/2019

REPLY - OTHER (WITH NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DEPOSITION OF DR. COKER) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/22/2019

REPLY - OTHER (WITH NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR DEPOSITION OF DR. COKER) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/22/2019

REPLY - OTHER (WITH NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/22/2019

REPLY - OTHER (WITH NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/22/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/22/2019 10:41:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/22/2019 10:41:00 AM.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/19/2019

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/19/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/19/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 04/19/2019

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE DEPOSITION OF THE PMK AND H.D. BERQUIST) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/18/2019

OPPOSITION (TO MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE DEPOSITION OF THE PMK AND H.D. BERQUIST) FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/18/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519629 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12343388.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12519629 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12343388.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY GREEN THUMB INTERNATIONAL INC. ON 03/19/2019

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/11/2019

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/11/2019

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 05/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,155.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554966 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378839.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/29/2019 09:20:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONTINUED TO 06/13/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONTINUED TO 06/13/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONTINUED TO 06/13/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION. DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 04/10/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketHETMAN, WAYNE T. REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/14/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 03/13/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HETMAN, WAYNE T. ON 03/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less