This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 11:52:12 (UTC).

WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION VS. KHANNA ENTERPRISES LTD., A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KHANNA ENTERPRISES LTD , A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wayne Distribution Center, a corporation

Wayne Distribution Center

Defendants

Ashwin Khanna

Khanna Enterprises Ltd.

Khanna Enterprises II, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gary S. Sherman

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

COMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650710.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650710.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER ON 12/29/2020

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER ON 12/29/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12669575.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12669575.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 01/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 01/22/2021

PAYMENT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER , TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE TO BE RE RUNG TO FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

PAYMENT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER , TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE TO BE RE RUNG TO FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842766 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670305.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842766 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670305.

PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE, TO BE RE RUNG AS FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

PAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE, TO BE RE RUNG AS FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670311.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670311.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670311.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR OTHER TRUST, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE, TO BE RE RUNG AS FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842766 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12670305.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER , TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. PDV REQUEST- INCORRECT FEE TYPE TO BE RE RUNG TO FEE TYPE 170 BY FISCAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41151692 RECEIVED ON 01/22/2021 10:03:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 44.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12842049 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12669575.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2969958 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2020 09:17:20 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 01/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER ON 12/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12823614 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12650710.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT - COLLECTIONS 3.740 (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY WAYNE DISTRIBUTION CENTER, A CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2968604 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2020 10:27:09 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less