This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/24/2019 at 08:14:52 (UTC).

WALTERS V WALTERS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2013 WALTERS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WALTERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HONER, SHERRI L. and VU, NATHAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2217

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

HONER, SHERRI L.

VU, NATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jenny Walters

Petitioner

WALTERS, JENNY

Defendant

Glenn Walters

Respondent

WALTERS, GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ellis & Abouelsood

Petitioner Attorney

ELLIS & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 07/07/2015 08:45:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2015 08:51:00 # Pages:12; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • RFO - MODIFICATION 05/15/2015 08:49:00 # Pages:5; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/23/2015 08:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • HEARING - OSC - CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 04/17/2015 08:09:00 ABSTRACT FEE # Pages:2; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE 04/03/2015 11:34:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • NOTICE - CONTINUANCE 02/24/2015 08:03:00 # Pages:9; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • NOTICE - UNDOCUMENTED ACTION 02/13/2015 07:36:00 # Pages:2

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/16/2013 14:29:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION 04/12/2013 11:09:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/12/2013 08:52:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/12/2013 08:52:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/12/2013 08:52:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/12/2013 13:37:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: WALTERS, GLENN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/22/2013 09:47:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/08/2013 10:28:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • SUMMONS 03/08/2013 10:28:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/08/2013 10:28:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: WALTERS, JENNY

    Read MoreRead Less