This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/19/2021 at 20:01:54 (UTC).

WALTER WASINACK VS. ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 WALTER WASINACK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER WASINACK

Defendant

ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY WASINACK, WALTER W. FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12839688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12667207.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12838455 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. CHECK #0158 IS STALE DATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12838455 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. CHECK #0158 IS STALE DATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY WASINACK, WALTER W. FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12838455 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12665930.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY WASINACK, WALTER ON 01/04/2021; Filing Party: WASINACK, WALTER ON 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL STATE INSURANCE is a litigant