This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 03:00:43 (UTC).

WALTER WARE VS. LIZETTE ELAINE WARE

Case Summary

On 09/03/2020 WALTER WARE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIZETTE ELAINE WARE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Ware

Defendants

Lizette Elaine Ware

County Records Research, Inc.

Orange Coast Title Co

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604061.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604061.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2938318 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2938318 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2939566 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2939566 REJECTED.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/10/2020 08:24:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/10/2020 08:24:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/28/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/28/2021 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT CHANGE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/25/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/25/2021 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2021-04-29 13:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2021-04-29 13:30:00.0.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 2021-04-29 13:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL 2021-04-29 13:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/25/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 04/29/2021 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO RESET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 04/29/2021 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO RESET.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/28/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/13/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2939566 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2938318 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12777366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12604061.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41111792 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2020 05:50:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 09/03/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY WARE, WALTER ON 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTY RECORDS RESEARCH INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COAST TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant