This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:28:40 (UTC).

WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC VS. JUAN ROSALES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JUAN ROSALES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC

Defendant

JUAN ROSALES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065537.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12241835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12065537.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12568250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12392225.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12568250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12392225.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/09/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 11/09/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 06/11/2019

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 06/11/2019

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 01/08/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12311018 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12134758.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12311018 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12134758.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/23/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/23/2017

WRIT (ISSUED AND MAILED ON 6/11/19) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019.

WRIT (ISSUED AND MAILED ON 6/11/19) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12568250 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12392225.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED AND MAILED ON 6/11/19) RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3800855 RECEIVED ON 06/11/2019 09:09:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12311018 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12134758.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 3/7/18) RECEIVED ON 03/07/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3643449 RECEIVED ON 03/07/2018 08:25:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/24/17) RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3599961 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017 08:09:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233316 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12056996.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WALLINGSFORD PARTNERS, LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428719 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 02:14:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.