This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:43 (UTC).

WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. VS. SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MO

Defendant

SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2016
  • STIPULATION/ORDER - OTHER (PER CCP 664.6) FILED BY SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC.; WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 05/31/2016; Filing Party: SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC.; WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 05/31/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 05/31/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC. ON 05/31/2016; Filing Party: SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY DEFENDANT'S BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • MEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/31/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • THE COURT ORDERS THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY PLAINTIFF'S BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3400851 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2016 04:20:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC. ON 04/07/2016; Filing Party: SUNSPARK TECHNOLOGY INC. ON 04/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/06/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WALKER BROTHERS FOR 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770205.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WALKER BROTHERS FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751043.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.