This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/30/2018 at 06:30:08 (UTC).

WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. VS. JUNO ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUNO ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MO

Defendant

JUNO ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS, INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • WRIT UPDATED ON 07/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 09/15/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 09/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WALKER BROTHERS FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11996618 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11820701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 05/31/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 05/31/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/03/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/15/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/06/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WALKER BROTHERS FOR 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 15.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946053 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770208.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/31/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 04/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY WALKER BROTHERS FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11926823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751044.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WALKER BROTHERS MACHINERY MOVING, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.