This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:44 (UTC).

WALDEN GLEN, LP VS. YESENIA YANEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 WALDEN GLEN, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YESENIA YANEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN GLEN, LP

Defendant

YESENIA YANEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

CORRECTED WRIT

CORRECTED WRIT

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 04/01/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 04/01/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927527 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751752.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927527 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751752.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757472.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933287 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757472.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/22/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/22/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 3/9/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 3/9/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2468734 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2016 04:14:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTED WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (POSSESSION ONLY) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3389054 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016 04:32:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927527 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751752.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385407 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 04:01:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.