This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 18:44:28 (UTC).

WALDEN GLEN, LP VS. JHON POL O DEL ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 12/30/2016 WALDEN GLEN, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JHON POL O DEL ROSARIO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALDEN GLEN, LP

Defendants

JHON POL O DEL ROSARIO

GLADYLEA SULITE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/02/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/02/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/01/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/01/2017.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/08/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/08/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12098785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11922733.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12098785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11922733.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/27/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/30/17) RECEIVED ON 01/27/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/30/17) RECEIVED ON 01/27/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/30/17) RECEIVED ON 01/27/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/30/17) RECEIVED ON 01/27/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/09/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/09/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12087366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11911345.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12087366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11911345.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908299.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908299.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/01/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (COURT JUDGMENT) FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4732492 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2017 11:38:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 02/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 01/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12087366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11911345.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4658753 RECEIVED ON 01/06/2017 04:48:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12084336 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11908299.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WALDEN GLEN, LP ON 12/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2519509 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016 09:46:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less