This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 06:45:43 (UTC).

WADE SCOTT FORD VS. MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 WADE SCOTT FORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WADE SCOTT FORD

Defendants

MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH

COUTY OF ORANGE

MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Downtown LA Law Group

Defendant Attorney

Bordin Semmer LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12622939 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12447425.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12622939 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12447425.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 09/13/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 09/13/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/09/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/09/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/06/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/06/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 11/19/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 11/19/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12487319.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12487319.

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490045.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490045.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR OTHER TRUST IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12665365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12490045.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12662640 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12487319.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF LAGUNA BEACH ON 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2861796 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2019 07:11:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1685998 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2019 04:57:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1685636 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2019 09:58:11 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 11/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2855170 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2019 10:45:41 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/09/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 09/13/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12622939 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12447425.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FORD, WADE SCOTT ON 09/13/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3834400 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2019 04:01:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less