This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/20/2019 at 06:52:54 (UTC).

VU V NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 01/17/2012 VU filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0377

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VU, TO-VAN HOANG

Respondent

NGUYEN, MARCUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/08/2012 14:15:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: NGUYEN, MARCUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/08/2012 14:14:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 11/08/2012 14:14:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • JUDGMENT 11/08/2012 14:13:00 # Pages:25; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 11/08/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/03/2012 11:34:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 08/03/2012 11:34:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/03/2012 10:45:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 05/21/2012 09:34:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/02/2012 08:14:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • SUMMONS 01/17/2012 11:07:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/17/2012 11:08:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/17/2012 11:07:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/17/2012 11:06:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: VU, TO-VAN HOANG

    Read MoreRead Less