This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 03:46:02 (UTC).

VIVIAN LAM VS. MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 VIVIAN LAM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivian Lam

Defendants

California Automobile Insurance Company

Mercury Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Office of Tien Ho

Defendant Attorney

Wesierski & Zurek LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/01/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/02/2022

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/02/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/20/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/20/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13159744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12987841.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13159744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12987841.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: KNILL; Department: C17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13159744 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12987841.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21249733 RECEIVED ON 12/20/2022 01:31:32 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO KIMBERLY KNILL EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41415420 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2022 05:57:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11060705 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2022 11:26:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketLAM, VIVIAN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 11/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LAM, VIVIAN ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21229802 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022 12:35:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant