This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 07:39:50 (UTC).

VIOLETA DEPIEROLA VS. ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 VIOLETA DEPIEROLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nicolas DePierola

Violeta DePierola

Defendants

Albertsons Companies, Inc.

Albertsons, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Jonathan Dwork, APLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12777464.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12777464.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MARKS; Department: C25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41248358 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021 08:01:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA ON 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1902048 RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021 08:01:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/05/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12949559 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12777464.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31067048 RECEIVED ON 09/27/2021 10:45:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 09/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DEPIEROLA, VIOLETA; DEPIEROLA, NICOLAS ON 09/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant