This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/28/2017 at 20:35:12 (UTC).

VILLASENOR-GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 VILLASENOR-GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Minor

ARIENNA C VILLASENOR

Guardian Ad Litems

ROSA M VILLASENOR

PRIMITIVO VILLASENOR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MISCELLANEOUS MATTER 10/22/2013 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • (P) MISCELLANEOUS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/2013 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 09/04/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/04/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/19/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/19/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/13/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/13/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/13/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CONSENT FILED BY VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: VILLASENOR, PRIMITIVO; VILLASENOR, ROSA M ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less