This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:20:24 (UTC).

VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC VS. IVANIA ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IVANIA ORTIZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

IVANIA ORTIZ

JOSE FIGUEROA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, APC

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/30/2013

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/30/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11436634 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11260546.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11436634 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11260546.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

COMPLAINT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/21/13) RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/21/13) RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11436634 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11260546.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/21/13) RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 466227 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2013 12:38:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VICTORIA TOWNHOUSE APARTMENTS, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348484 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 05:33:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less