This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 06:07:15 (UTC).

VICTOR ALVAREZ VS. ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 VICTOR ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICTOR ALVAREZ

Defendant

ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAHONEY LAW GROUP, APC

Defendant Attorney

Carothers DiSante & Fruedenberger LLP

Other Attorneys

BARTH CALDERON LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/19/2019 03:34:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/19/2019 03:34:00 PM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/17/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/17/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/21/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/21/2019 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 03/14/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 03/14/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/27/2018 10:31:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/27/2018 10:31:00 AM.

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 11/20/2018

JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 11/20/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 10/31/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 10/31/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/28/2018 02:15:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/28/2018 02:15:00 PM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 08/23/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 08/23/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 05/09/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 05/09/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/03/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/03/2018 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BARTH, TESS FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12340420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164150.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BARTH, TESS FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12340420 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164150.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (JOINT) FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 04/26/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (JOINT) FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 04/26/2018

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 04/26/2018

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 04/26/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/05/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/05/2018 09:00:00 AM.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/19/2019 03:34:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 09/19/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3803192 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2019 03:46:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/21/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 06/21/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/21/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 03/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1393424 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2017 11:27:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12175711 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11999411.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1393379 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2017 10:33:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 06/20/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12174745 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11998445.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALVAREZ, VICTOR ON 06/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2565184 RECEIVED ON 06/20/2017 10:50:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATCHISON EXPRESS is a litigant