This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/18/2018 at 02:32:03 (UTC).

VICK SAINI VS. MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/19/2016 VICK SAINI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VICK SAINI

Defendant

MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE CARTER LAW FIRM

THE COOPER LAW FIRM, P.C.

THE PHELPS LAW GROUP

Defendant Attorney

CURLEY, HURTGEN & JOHNSRUD LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12000995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11825063.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12000995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11825063.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 07/19/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 07/19/2016.

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/09/2016 10:05:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/09/2016 10:05:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/18/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/18/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11840622.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11840622.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/19/2016

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/19/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2016 11:31:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2016 11:31:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/23/2016 11:31:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • THE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO OMNI EFFECTIVE 08/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3448227 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2016 11:43:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12016568 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11840622.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, LLC ON 08/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2486768 RECEIVED ON 08/18/2016 11:33:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2016
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 07/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12000995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11825063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SAINI, VICK ON 07/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4578081 RECEIVED ON 07/19/2016 12:49:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTION RECRUITMENT PARTNERS, INC. is a litigant