This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 14:47:27 (UTC).

VI- CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 VI- CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Conservator

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Conservatee

SOLOMON VI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee, Petitioner and Conservator Attorney

COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: (P) ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Department: C09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3961000 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2020 01:27:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP RECEIVED ON 12/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF FIREARM PROHIBITION/RELEASE FILED AND COPY SENT TO DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/25/2020; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CONSERVATORSHIP HEARING 11/25/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(P) ACCOUNTING REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/26/2022 AT 03:00:00 PM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTHE COURT SETS A (P) ACCOUNTING REVIEW FOR 01/26/2022 AT 03:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT C9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC GUARDIAN APPOINTED AS CONSERVATOR OF PERSON AND ESTATE OF SOLOMON VI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2949086 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2020 07:57:38 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/15/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT OF LPS CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C09 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1775116 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2020 11:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY LETTERS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE AND TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND APPLICATION FOR ADDITIONAL POWERS FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020; Filing Party: PUBLIC GUARDIAN ON 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED ON 10/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOLOMON AKA DONALD RAY SOLOMON AKA DON R, DONALD R. is a litigant

Latest cases where PUBLIC GUARDIAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COUNTY COUNSEL, COUNTY OF ORANGE