Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 07:47:04 (UTC).

VERTICAL INFILL, INC. VS. FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 VERTICAL INFILL, INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vertical Infill, Inc.

Defendants

First American Title Insurance Company

First American Title Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gregory S. Page

Defendant Attorney

Best Best and Krieger LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689183.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689183.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/09/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/09/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861460 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689181.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861460 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689181.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY; FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY; FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/10/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/26/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/26/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 02/02/2021

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 02/02/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/28/2021 03:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/28/2021 03:36:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/22/2021

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/14/2021

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12830178 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12657497.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12830178 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12657497.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689183.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1820291 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2021 12:33:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12861460 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12689181.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3986837 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2021 04:22:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1820766 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2021 12:23:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/26/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY; FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3973882 RECEIVED ON 01/22/2021 11:46:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41149245 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2021 01:39:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 01/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12830178 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12657497.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY VERTICAL INFILL, INC. ON 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41147852 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2021 11:00:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant