This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:50 (UTC).

VEROS CREDIT, LLC VS. DIEDRE ENGLISH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 VEROS CREDIT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIEDRE ENGLISH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEROS CREDIT, LLC

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER ENGLISH

DIEDRE ENGLISH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROBERT M. TENNANT

RAYMOND J. NAPLES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751709.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751709.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC; VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/29/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC; VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 04/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 04/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4538679 RECEIVED ON 04/26/2016 04:13:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC; VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4510149 RECEIVED ON 02/29/2016 09:42:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927484 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751709.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VEROS CREDIT, LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509459 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:11:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.