This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:17:37 (UTC).

VERONICA CASTRO VS JOEL ARTEAGA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by VERONICA CASTRO against JOEL ARTEAGA in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2499

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Others

ARTEAGA, JOEL

CASTRO, VERONICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 12/13/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • ORDER - TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) - DENIED 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • RFO - MODIFICATION 12/13/2017 Active Protection Order; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW Active Protection Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - FAMILY LAW 12/13/2017 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • ACCEPT - WILSON - STIP TO COMMISSIONER - ALL PURPOSES 12/04/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DV RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING 12/04/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DV REQUEST - CONTINUE HEARING 10/16/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 10/16/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DECLARATION - TRANSLATOR - ORAL 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: CASTRO, VERONICA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.