This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:19:38 (UTC).

VANESSA SHERIDAN VS PAUL SHERIDAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 VANESSA SHERIDAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PAUL SHERIDAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1902

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHERIDAN, VANESSA

Respondent

SHERIDAN, PAUL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: SHERIDAN, VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.