This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:49:22 (UTC).

VANESSA BROWN VS. JULIANA ARCOS

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 VANESSA BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIANA ARCOS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANESSA BROWN

Defendant

JULIANA ARCOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • EXHIBITS HELD PURSUANT TO CCP 1952

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 02/13/2018 04:33:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 02/13/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY BROWN, VANESSA ON 01/29/2018; Filing Party: BROWN, VANESSA ON 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/13/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO N18 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER ON 02/13/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2620468 RECEIVED ON 12/11/2017 02:11:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY BROWN, VANESSA ON 12/11/2017; Filing Party: BROWN, VANESSA ON 12/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3615623 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12235243 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058923.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600661 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 03:15:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY BROWN, VANESSA ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BROWN, VANESSA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.