This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:18 (UTC).

VALENTIN VESE VS. DESIREA SLOAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 VALENTIN VESE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DESIREA SLOAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENTIN VESE

Defendants

DESIREA SLOAN

DAVID HALPIN

DESREA SLOAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF .50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12156519 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11980239.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/16/2017; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • AMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/03/2017; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/22/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/15/2017; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARINGS FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/15/2017; Filing Party: VES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/27/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2016
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARINGS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/11/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 08/10/2016; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/29/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/11/2016; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 05/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • AMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 04/22/2016; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 04/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • VESE, VALENTIN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: VESE, VALENTIN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.